VA SB709 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recalled motor vehicles. Requires a manufacturer or distributor that establishes a program that prohibits dealers from selling used motor vehicles that have been issued a safety recall and remain unremedied to provide a remedy for each such vehicle or to compensate the dealer for costs when such program is enforced through penalty or loss of benefits. The bill requires a manufacturer or distributor to compensate dealers for recall repairs on the same basis as warranty repairs. Finally, the bill prohibits a manufacturer or distributor from using performance measurements to the detriment of a dealer when the dealer has vehicles it cannot deliver by law or by manufacturer or distributor program or directive. Violations of these provisions are subject to a civil penalty by the Motor Vehicle Dealer Board not to exceed $1,000 per violation.
Title
Recalled motor vehicles; disclosures by and compensation of dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 534 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB709ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB709S2 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Substitute by Senator McDougle agreed to 16105443D-S2 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 16105443D-S2 (McDougle) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 16105096D-S1 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB709S1 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105096D-S1 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105096D-S1 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16104434D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1232 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0432)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1529.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1569 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1571 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1572.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |