VA SB704 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Overtime compensation; fire protection employees. Broadens the definition of "fire protection employee" for the purposes of determining eligibility for overtime compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overtime compensation; broadens definition of fire protection employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
2016-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 541 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
2016-03-09SenateSigned by President
2016-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB704ER)
2016-03-07SenateEnrolled
2016-03-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-03-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-03-04HouseRead third time
2016-03-03HouseRead second time
2016-03-01HouseReported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
2016-02-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2016-02-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2016-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2016-02-11HouseRead first time
2016-02-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2016-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2016-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-01SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N)
2016-01-21SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2016-01-21SenatePresented and ordered printed 16104090D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91700(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+SB704
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB704+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+SB704ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0541+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S12V0049+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0187SB0704+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0212SB0704+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H1101V0023+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H11V0222+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H11V0242+SB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1167+SB0704

Bill Comments

feedback