VA SB697 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid; managed care. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to continue efforts to expand managed care of Medicaid recipients throughout the Commonwealth, to the extent possible. The Department shall have a goal of achieving statewide managed care by July 1, 2012.
Title
Medicaid; DMAS to continue efforts to expand managed care of recipients throughout State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Senate: Left in Education and Health | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104157D |