VA SB695 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 16 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Retirement benefits for local school superintendents. Permits a retired member of the Virginia Retirement System to return to work as a local school division superintendent and still maintain his monthly retirement payments. Such option currently is available to certain other local school board instructional or administrative employees under certain conditions. The bill also repeals sunset dates relating to allowing retired persons to work as teachers, administrative personnel, and school division superintendents while receiving their VRS retirement pay.
Title
Retirement System; benefits for local school superintendents.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-02-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Jones, S.C.) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 084773320 | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB695 |