VA SB69 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0992)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Purchase of handguns; limitation on handgun purchases; penalty. Prohibits any person who is not a licensed firearms dealer from purchasing more than one handgun in a 30-day period and establishes such an offense as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts from this provision (i) persons who have been issued a certificate by the Department of State Police under certain circumstances and with an enhanced background check, (ii) law-enforcement agencies and officers, (iii) state and local correctional facilities, (iv) licensed private security companies, (v) persons who hold a valid Virginia concealed handgun permit, (vi) persons whose handgun has been stolen or irretrievably lost or who are trading in a handgun, (vii) purchases of handguns in a private sale, and (viii) purchases of antique firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handguns; limitation on purchases, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0992)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 992 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB69ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (52-Y 47-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-02-28HouseDelegates: Ward, Hope, Wright
2020-02-28HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-27SenateSenators: Locke, Deeds, Stuart
2020-02-27SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-27SenateSenate acceded to request (23-Y 17-N)
2020-02-25HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-25HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-24SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
2020-02-21SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-19HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N)
2020-02-19HousePassed House with substitute (53-Y 47-N)
2020-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB69H1
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108288D-H1
2020-02-19HouseRead third time
2020-02-18HouseRead second time
2020-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108288D-H1
2020-02-14HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-01-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB69S1
2020-01-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105654D-S1
2020-01-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-15SenateRead second time
2020-01-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105654D-S1
2020-01-13SenateIncorporates SB22 (Saslaw)
2020-01-13SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-22SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101200D

Same As/Similar To

SB22 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB812 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0991)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB69&201+sum+SB69
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB69+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB69S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB69H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB69ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0992+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0009+SB0069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0035SB0069+SB0069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0050SB0069+SB0069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0091+SB0069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1024+SB0069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0855SB0069+SB0069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1153SB0069+SB0069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1965+SB0069
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1758SB0069+SB0069

Bill Comments

feedback