VA HB812 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0991)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Purchase of handguns; limitation on handgun purchases; penalty. Prohibits any person who is not a licensed firearms dealer from purchasing more than one handgun in a 30-day period and establishes such an offense as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts from this provision (i) persons who have been issued a certificate by the Department of State Police under certain circumstances and with an enhanced background check, (ii) law-enforcement agencies and officers, (iii) state and local correctional facilities, (iv) licensed private security companies, (v) persons who hold a valid Virginia concealed handgun permit, (vi) persons whose handgun has been stolen or irretrievably lost or who are trading in a handgun, (vii) purchases of handguns in a private sale, and (viii) purchases of antique firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handguns; limitation on purchases, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0991)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 991 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB812ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (51-Y 48-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Locke, Deeds, Stuart
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-04HouseDelegates: Ward, Hope, Wright
2020-03-04HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-04HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-03SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-03SenateSenate insisted on substitute (23-Y 17-N)
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20108962D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-27SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB812S1
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108962D-S1
2020-02-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108962D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-30HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N)
2020-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 47-N)
2020-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB812H1
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106618D-H1
2020-01-29HousePassed by temporarily
2020-01-29HouseRead second time
2020-01-28HouseRead first time
2020-01-24HouseIncorporates HB1502 (Ward)
2020-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106618D-H1
2020-01-24HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103354D

Same As/Similar To

HB1502 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Public Safety
SB69 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0992)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB812&201+sum+HB812
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB812+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB812H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB812S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB812ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0991+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0017+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0212+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0421+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0986HB0812+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1169HB0812+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1174HB0812+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1175HB0812+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1678+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1405HB0812+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1976+HB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1713HB0812+HB0812

Bill Comments

feedback