VA SB688 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Determination of competency; report to Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. Provides that a copy of the competency report shall be sent to the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services for the purpose of (i) conducting peer review and (ii) monitoring use of forensic assessments by the courts and their impact on the defendants and the public. Under current law, copies of such reports are sent to the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services for the purposes of establishing and maintaining the list of approved evaluators.
Title
Determination of competency; report to Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22104203D-E |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB688E |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104203D |