VA SB681 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Compensation of experts in criminal cases. Increases from $750 to $1,200 the maximum fee that the court may pay for professional services rendered by each psychiatrist, clinical psychologist, or other expert appointed by the court to render professional service in a criminal case other than capital murder. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Criminal cases; compensation of experts, effective clause.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20103863D-E |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB681E |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103863D |
Same As/Similar To
SB681 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote