VA SB68 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate with delinquent taxes. Changes, under certain circumstances, the criteria for transferring certain tax-delinquent real property to localities through a special commissioner in the Cities of Norfolk, Richmond, Hopewell, Newport News, Petersburg, and Hampton by reducing the percentage of taxes and liens from exceeding 35 percent to 20 percent and of taxes alone from 15 percent to 10 percent, respectively, and including parcels with an assessed value of $100,000 or less. The reduced criteria apply only if the dwelling is not occupied and the locality enters into an agreement to sell the property to a nonprofit entity to renovate or construct housing to be sold to a low-income person.
Title
Real estate; delinquent taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 519 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB68ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Title replaced 14105013D-H1 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed House with substitute (83-Y 16-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB68H1 |
2014-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-26 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (53-Y 44-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Defeated by House (53-Y 44-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105013D-H1 |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2014-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105013D-H1 |
2014-02-24 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14101941D-E |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB68E |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Garrett agreed to |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101941D |