VA SB67 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adverse possession; abolition. Abolishes adverse possession as a cause of action or a defense if arising on or after July 1, 2010.
Title
Adverse possession; abolition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Senate: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Subject matter referred by letter to Virginia Bar Association pursuant to Senate Rule 20 (L). | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103188D |