VA SB667 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Innovative Internship Program; Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment. Directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to partner with the Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment to collect and utilize data that includes the gaps that are most significant in hindering the Commonwealth from achieving its goals that its funds are intended to accomplish under the Innovative Internship Program and provides other directives to the Council and the Office to collaborate on and accomplish for the Innovative Internship Program. Innovative Internship Program; Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment. Directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to partner with the Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment to collect and utilize data that includes the gaps that are most significant in hindering the Commonwealth from achieving its goals that its funds are intended to accomplish under the Innovative Internship Program and provides other directives to the Council and the Office to collaborate on and accomplish for the Innovative Internship Program.
Title
Innovative Internship Program; SCHEV, et. al, to collect and utilize certain data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB667ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-07 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22104777D-E |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB667E |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104777D |