VA SB665 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Common Interest Community Board; powers and duties. Clarifies the authority of the Common Interest Community Board to impose monetary penalties and enter into consent agreements related to investigations and disciplinary proceedings. In addition, the bill (i) authorizes the Board to use informal fact-finding conferences in lieu of formal hearings and (ii) clarifies the authority of the Board regarding property owners' associations.
Title
Common Interest Community Board; powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 615 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB665ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103735D-E | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB665E | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10103735D |