VA SB665 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Summary
Tire recycling fee. Extends, until July 1, 2011, the $1.00 recycling fee imposed on each new tire sold; thereafter, the fee is reduced to 50 cents. Identical to
Title
Tire recycling fee; extended until July 1, 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 158 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB665ER) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-20 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Passed House (87-Y 9-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: 1 | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 083940822 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB665 |