VA SB663 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State plan for medical assistance services; provision for payment of telemedicine services facilitated by emergency medical services. Directs the Board of Health to amend the state plan for medical assistance services to include a provision for the payment of the originating site fee to emergency medical services agencies for facilitating synchronous telehealth visits with a distant site provider delivered to a Medicaid member. The bill defines "originating site" as any location where the patient is located, including any medical care facility or office of a health care provider, the home of the patient, the patient's place of employment, or any public or private primary or secondary school or postsecondary institution of higher education at which the person to whom telemedicine services are provided is located. State plan for medical assistance services; provision for payment of telemedicine services facilitated by emergency medical services. Directs the Board of Health to amend the state plan for medical assistance services to include a provision for the payment of the originating site fee to emergency medical services agencies for facilitating synchronous telehealth visits with a distant site provider delivered to a Medicaid member. The bill defines "originating site" as any location where the patient is located, including any medical care facility or office of a health care provider, the home of the patient, the patient's place of employment, or any public or private primary or secondary school or postsecondary institution of higher education at which the person to whom telemedicine services are provided is located.
Title
Telemedicine services; state plan for medical assistance services, provision for payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB663ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions substitute rejected 22107225D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Reconsidered by Appropriations |
2022-03-04 | House | Tabled in Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107225D-H1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104431D |