VA SB663 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Letter sent to the Virginia Bar Association
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Practice of medicine and other healing arts; provision of litigation assistance. Requires practitioners of medicine and other healing arts to provide litigation assistance to treated patients and their attorneys. Such litigation assistance includes providing a legal consult fee schedule upon request, scheduling and participating in meetings with a treated patient's attorney upon request, participating in trial or de bene esse depositions as needed, and providing a written estimate of the cost of the patient's medical services related to the litigation. The bill prohibits providers from refusing services to a patient who is insured or otherwise has the ability to pay for provided services on the ground that such person was involved in an incident that is the subject of litigation or could result in litigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Practice of medicine and other healing arts; provision of litigation assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08SenateLetter sent to the Virginia Bar Association
2020-04-08SenateLetter sent to the Medical Society of Virginia
2020-01-30SenatePassed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (13-Y 2-N)
2020-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20105716D-S1
2020-01-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101354D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412910.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback