VA SB66 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB81-Cuccinelli) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB81-Cuccinelli) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Emergency custody; who may accept custody. Allows the location to which a person is transported pursuant to an emergency custody order to accept custody of the person where (i) the location is licensed to provide the level of security necessary to protect the person and others from harm, (ii) the location is actually able to provide the level of security necessary to protect the person and others from harm, and (iii) the location is willing to accept custody of the person. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Emergency custody; who may accept custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB81-Cuccinelli) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2007-12-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2007-12-21 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084538248 |
Same As/Similar To
SB81 (Similar To) 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB66 |