VA SB656 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local property tax; separate classification for renewable energy manufacturing tangible personal property and improvements to real property. Adds tangible personal property and improvements to real property designed and used primarily for manufacturing a product from renewable energy as separate classifications of property for local property tax purposes.
Title
Property tax, local; separate classification for renewable energy manufacturing tangible property.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB656ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB656S1 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104669D-S1 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104669D-S1 | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104140D |