VA SB653 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; exception. Allows the Commissioner of Health to accept and approve a request to amend the conditions of a certificate of public need issued to a continuing care provider registered with the State Corporation Commission in which nursing facility or extended care services are provided to allow such continuing care provider to continue to admit community patients, other than contract holders, to its nursing facility beds through December 31, 2013, if the following conditions are met: (i) the facility is located in the City of Norfolk and operated as a not-for-profit and (ii) the facility's contract holder occupancy rate is less than 85 percent at the time of such application.
Title
Certificate of public need; Commissioner of Health to accept & approve request to amend conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688) | |
2010-04-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 688 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB653ER) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103636D-E | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB653E | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10103636D |