VA SB646 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; claims. Provides that in claims for an award under the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund involving claims of sexual abuse of a minor where the conduct constitutes a felony, the passage of time shall not be a barrier to when the victim can file a claim. Under current law, such claim involving sexual abuse of a minor shall be filed within 10 years after the minor's eighteenth birthday.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB646ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | House receded from substitute (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB646H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107782D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107782D-H1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24105210D |
Same As/Similar To
HB155 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)