VA SB635 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Senate districts; technical adjustments. Makes technical changes in Senate Districts 1, 2, 3, 4, 10, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 23, 25, 28, 29, 30, 33, 36, 37, and 39 in order to eliminate split voting precincts and otherwise facilitate administration of legislative elections by local officials. All districts remain within two percent deviation of the ideal population.
Title
Senate Districts; technical adjustments in boundaries.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. John Watkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(g) |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Recommitted to Privileges and Elections |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 12105300D-S2 (Hanger) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB491 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB490 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 12105102D-S1 |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2012-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 12102384D |
Same As/Similar To
SB490 (Similar To)