VA SB633 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Summary
Prisoners; Department of Corrections and Division of Child Support Enforcement to identify child support due. Requires the Department of Corrections, working in cooperation with the Division of Child Support Enforcement, to identify, at least annually, prisoners of whom child support payments are required pursuant to a court order and the amount of child support required of the prisoner pursuant to the order.
Title
Prisoners; notification of child support payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB633ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB633H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081573336-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Substitute bill reprinted 081573336-H1 | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 081573336-H1 | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-22 | House: Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 083116304-E | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB633E | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (13-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083116304 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB633 |