VA SB631 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Gang-free zones; penalties. Expands current "gang-free school zones" to the broader "gang-free zones" and includes any school bus stop or the property, including buildings and grounds, of any publicly owned or operated community center, park, library, or hospital. Engaging in criminal street gang activity in a gang-free zone is a Class 5 or 6 felony and may include a two-year mandatory minimum sentence, depending upon other aggravators.
Title
Gang-free zones; expanded to include any school bus stop or public buildings, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104645D-S1 | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 10103486D | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10103486D | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |