VA SB625 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Deferred or installment payment agreements; certain benefits. Provides that in any case in which a defendant owes fines and costs and where such defendant's sole financial resource is a Social Security benefit or Supplemental Security Income, such defendant shall be exempt from making payments until he has another source of income and, if such defendant notifies the court that his sole financial resource is a Social Security benefit or Supplemental Security Income, the case shall not be referred to collections. The bill also prohibits a Social Security benefit or Supplemental Security Income from being considered an available resource in determining the length of time to pay under a deferred, modified deferred, or installment payment agreement and the amount of payments, if any.
Title
Deferred or installment payment agreements; exempt from payments if sole income is Social Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB625ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (74-Y 26-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB625S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106332D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106332D-S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103452D |