VA SB618 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
Summary
Petit larceny; substance abuse. Provides that a person who is convicted for the second time of petit larceny must undergo substance abuse screening as part of the sentence if the sentence includes probation supervision by a community-based probation services agency.
Title
Petit larceny; person who is convicted for second time must undergo substance abuse screening.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 762 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB618ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081526328 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB618 |