VA SB609 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
Summary
Alien status of jail and correctional facility inmates. Requires an officer in charge of a jail or correctional facility to inquire of a person in his custody as to whether the person was born in or is a citizen of the United States and to make an immigration alien query to the Law Enforcement Support Center of the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for any person who was born in or is a citizen of another country, or if the answers to these questions are unknown. The jail officer shall communicate the results of this immigration alien query to the Local Inmate Data System of the State Compensation Board. The State Compensation Board shall communicate, on a monthly basis, the results of any query confirming that a person is illegally present in the United States to the Central Criminal Records Exchange. This bill is identical to
Title
Inmates; officer of correctional facility to inquire of alien status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB609ER) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-20 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB609H1 | |
2008-02-20 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080884404-H1 | |
2008-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Committee substitute printed 080884404-H1 | |
2008-02-15 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB609S1 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080278328-S1 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080278328-S1 | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Immigration | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081697838 |
Same As/Similar To
HB820 (Same As) 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB609 |