VA SB601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Trespass towing. Exempts Planning District 16 (George Washington) from any requirement by a towing advisory board for written authorization, in addition to a written contract, in the event that a vehicle is being removed from private property. The bill requires that localities in Planning District 16 establish by ordinance (i) a hookup and initial towing fee of $135; (ii) an additional fee of $25 for towing at night, on weekends, or on a holiday; and (iii) that no fee pursuant to clause (ii) shall be charged more than twice for a tow. This bill is identical to HB 1349.
Title
Trespass towing; exempts Planning District 16 from certain requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 412 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB601ER) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed House (74-Y 23-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103338D |