VA SB596 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, Certified Interior Designers and Landscape Architects; issuance of license; emeritus designation. Establishes an emeritus designation for licensees of the Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, Certified Interior Designers and Landscape Architects who have retired from their practice provided (i) the license has not been revoked or suspended by the Board and (ii) the license holder does not practice or offer to practice architecture, engineering, land surveying, or landscape architecture.
Title
Architects, Professional Engineers, etc., Board for; establishes emeritus designation for licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB596ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed House (96-Y 3-N 1-A) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10103737D |