VA SB586 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exhaust system in good working order; exclusion. Excludes vehicles licensed as antique motor vehicles from the requirement that such vehicle be equipped with an exhaust system in good working order and in constant operation to prevent excessive or unusual levels of noise. Current law excludes antique motor vehicles manufactured prior to 1950 from such requirements.
Title
Antique motor vehicles; exhaust system excluded from certain requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 655 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB586ER) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103722D |