VA SB585 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility regulation; recovery of costs of new underground distribution facilities. Authorizes investor-owned electric utilities to recover the costs of new underground distribution facilities through a rate adjustment clause. Eligible facilities will replace existing overhead distribution facilities of 69 kilovolts or less. Petitions seeking approval for recovery of such costs shall not be brought more frequently than annually. A utility shall not seek any annual incremental increase in the level of investments in such facilities that exceeds five percent of the utility's distribution rate base. In determining whether to approve a rate adjustment clause for such facilities, the State Corporation Commission is directed to liberally construe the provisions of Title 56 and to give due consideration to the public policy goals of increased electric service reliability and reduced outage times associated with the replacement of existing overhead distribution facilities with new underground facilities. None of the costs of such new facilities shall be allocated to customers in the large power service rate class for a Phase I utility or general service rate classes for a Phase II utility. The measure also rewords a provision that currently states that nothing precludes the Commission from determining the reasonableness or prudence of any cost incurred or projected to be incurred by a utility.
Title
Electric utility regulation; recovery of costs of new underground distribution facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N 3-A) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB585ER) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N 3-A) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House (86-Y 10-N 3-A) |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB585S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104129D-S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104129D-S1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14101925D |