VA SB576 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; uninsured employer's fund financing tax. Extends until July 1, 2015, the existing 0.5 percent maximum tax rate that may be assessed on uninsured or self-insured employers. The maximum rate is scheduled to revert to 0.25 percent on July 1, 2012. The revenues from the tax fund workers' compensation benefits that are awarded against such employers from the uninsured employer's fund.
Title
Workers' compensation; uninsured employer's fund financing tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647) | |
2012-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 647 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB576ER) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Passed House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103087D |