VA SB57 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying a concealed handgun onto the premises of any restaurant; penalty. Makes it a Class 2 misdemeanor for any person, except for active and qualified retired law-enforcement officers, to carry a concealed handgun onto the premises of any restaurant or club for which a license to sell and serve alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption has been granted by the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority. Under current law, a concealed handgun permit holder may carry a concealed handgun onto the premises of any restaurant or club that sells alcoholic beverages, but he is guilty of a Class 2 misdemeanor if he consumes an alcoholic beverage while on the premises.
Title
Concealed handgun; carrying onto the premises of any restaurant, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103837D |
Subjects
Concealed Weapons
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Handguns
Hotels Restaurants Summer Camps and Campgrounds
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Handguns
Hotels Restaurants Summer Camps and Campgrounds