VA SB569 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB569
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Coastal Virginia Resiliency Authority; established. Establishes the Coastal Virginia Resiliency Authority (the Authority) as a body politic and corporate, a political subdivision of the Commonwealth. The bill provides that the Authority shall be governed by a 17-member Board of Directors as follows: (i) the Secretary of Natural and Historic Resources or his designee; (ii) the Secretary of Transportation or his designee; (iii) the Chair of the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources or his designee; (iv) the Chair of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources or his designee; (v) two members of the Senate appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules; (vi) two members of the House of Delegates appointed by the Speaker of the House; (vii) an Officer, defined in the bill, from the each of the Hampton Roads, Crater, Richmond Region, Middle Peninsula, Northern Neck, and Accomack-Northampton Planning District Commissions selected by the Governor; and (viii) three nonlegislative members who reside in the Hampton Roads, Crater, Richmond Region, Middle Peninsula, Northern Neck, or Accomack-Northampton Planning District Commissions appointed by the Joint Rules Committee. Certain portions of the bill have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023. Coastal Virginia Resiliency Authority; established. Establishes the Coastal Virginia Resiliency Authority (the Authority) as a body politic and corporate, a political subdivision of the Commonwealth. The bill provides that the Authority shall be governed by a 17-member Board of Directors as follows: (i) the Secretary of Natural and Historic Resources or his designee; (ii) the Secretary of Transportation or his designee; (iii) the Chair of the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources or his designee; (iv) the Chair of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources or his designee; (v) two members of the Senate appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules; (vi) two members of the House of Delegates appointed by the Speaker of the House; (vii) an Officer, defined in the bill, from the each of the Hampton Roads, Crater, Richmond Region, Middle Peninsula, Northern Neck, and Accomack-Northampton Planning District Commissions selected by the Governor; and (viii) three nonlegislative members who reside in the Hampton Roads, Crater, Richmond Region, Middle Peninsula, Northern Neck, or Accomack-Northampton Planning District Commissions appointed by the Joint Rules Committee. Certain portions of the bill have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023.
Title
Coastal Virginia Resiliency Authority; established, members, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106271D-S1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103952D |
Same As/Similar To
SB569 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 603.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2377 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2387 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |