VA SB568 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; student loan information. Requires any public institution of higher education that receives federal education loan information for a student enrolled in the institution to provide such student, at least once during each academic year, certain information and estimates regarding the student's federal education loans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; federal student loan information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB568ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-03-05HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-05HouseRead third time
2018-03-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-28HouseReported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102132D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231411(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB568
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB568+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB568ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0589+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0137+SB0568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0263SB0568+SB0568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0295SB0568+SB0568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0903V0045+SB0568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0172+SB0568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1262+SB0568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0959SB0568+SB0568

Bill Comments

feedback