VA SB568 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Involuntary admission; contents of preadmission screening report; notice of hearing. Provides that the community services board that prepares the preadmission screening report admitted into evidence at a person's involuntary admission hearing, if the report recommends that the person is not in need of involuntary treatment, must include in such report any contrary recommendations, if available, by the person's personal representative, relatives, or treating or examining physician. The bill requires further that the judge or special justice conducting the hearing consider, if available, the recommendations of the person's personal representative and relatives. The bill also requires that notice of the hearing be given to the person's personal representative, or if the person has no personal representative and the individual who petitioned for the person's involuntary admission is not a relative of the person, the nearest known relative of the person. Finally, the bill imposes a duty on health care providers providing services to a person subject to emergency custody, temporary detention, or involuntary admission proceedings to make a reasonable attempt to notify the person's family member or personal representative and clarifies that such representative includes an agent named in an advance directive; currently, such health care provider has discretion as to whether to make such notification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Involuntary admission; contents of preadmission screening report; notice of hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateFailed to pass in Senate
2016-03-11SenateNo further action taken
2016-02-16SenatePassed by for the day
2016-02-16SenateRead second time
2016-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2016-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-10SenateCommittee substitute printed 16105446D-S1
2016-02-10SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A)
2016-01-13SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2016-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103566D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161337(n/a)See Bill Text
161340.4(n/a)See Bill Text
161345(n/a)See Bill Text
161345.2(n/a)See Bill Text
372804.2(n/a)See Bill Text
372814(n/a)See Bill Text
372816(n/a)See Bill Text
372817(n/a)See Bill Text
372817.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback