VA SB564 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0272)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0272)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Freedom of Information Act; exclusions for school personnel licensure applications. Excludes records of an application for licensure or renewal of a license for teachers and other school personnel, including transcripts or other documents submitted in support of an application, from the provisions of the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; exclusions for school personnel licensure applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0272) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 272 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 8, 2016 | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/1/16 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB564ER) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House (93-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #2 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102728D |