VA SB563 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
Summary
Cases held under advisement; time limit. Provides that whenever a judge of a circuit court holds a civil case under advisement for more than 90 days after final submission of the case, the court shall report, in writing, to the parties or their counsel an expected time of a decision. If such a judge (i) holds a civil case under advisement for more than 90 days, (ii) fails to make the required written report, or (iii) fails to render a decision within the expected time stated in the report, any party may notify the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court. Whenever the Chief Justice, or any justice designated by him, has reasonable cause to believe that any judge of a court of record may be holding a civil case under advisement for an unreasonable length of time, he shall inquire into the cause of the delay and shall, if necessary, designate a judge or retired judge of a court of record to assist the regular judge in the performance of his duties. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Civil cases; time limit for those held under advisement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 813 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB563ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 080207400-E | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB563E | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 5-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080207400 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB563 |