VA SB562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restitution; collection; Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund. Adds to the duties of the Workers' Compensation Commission (the Commission) in its role as administrator of the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund (Fund) the obligation to (i) identify and locate victims for whom restitution owed to such victims has been deposited into the Fund and (ii) collect and disburse such unclaimed restitution to such victims. The bill directs the Commission to include in its annual report information on all unclaimed restitution that it disburses. The bill provides that clerks shall deposit into the Fund by November 1 of each year restitution collected for victims who can no longer be identified or located, or state that there is no such restitution to be deposited. The bill requires that clerks record the receipt of restitution payments in the automated information system operated by the Supreme Court of Virginia or a system established and maintained by a circuit court. The bill also provides that the restitution form used by the court shall include the victim's contact information, including address, telephone number, and email address. This bill is identical to HB 483.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; restitution owed to victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 725 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB562ER) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-07 | House | Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Gilbert, Herring |
2018-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Reeves, Howell |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB562H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to18107315D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107315D-H1 |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18106181D-ES1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB562ES1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106181D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106181D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102977D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 349 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 368.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |