VA SB561 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; post-traumatic stress disorder; law-enforcement officers and firefighters. Provides that post-traumatic stress disorder incurred by a law-enforcement officer or firefighter is compensable under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act if a mental health professional examines a law-enforcement officer or firefighter and diagnoses the individual as suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder as a result of the individual's undergoing a qualifying event, defined as an incident or exposure occurring in the line of duty on or after July 1, 2020, (i) resulting in serious bodily injury or death to any person or persons; (ii) involving a minor who has been injured, killed, abused, or exploited; (iii) involving an immediate threat to life of the claimant or another individual; (iv) involving mass casualties; or (v) responding to crime scenes for investigation. Other conditions for compensability include (a) if the post-traumatic stress disorder resulted from the law-enforcement officer or firefighter acting in the line of duty and, in the case of a firefighter, such firefighter complied with certain federal Occupational Safety and Health Act standards; (b) if the law-enforcement officer's or firefighter's undergoing of a qualifying event was a substantial factor in causing his post-traumatic stress disorder; (c) if such qualifying event, and not another event or source of stress, was the primary cause of the post-traumatic stress disorder; and (d) if the post-traumatic stress disorder did not result from any disciplinary action, work evaluation, job transfer, layoff, demotion, promotion, termination, retirement, or similar action of the officer or firefighter. The measure also establishes requirements for resilience and self-care technique training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; post-traumatic stress disorder, law-enforcement officers and firefighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendments specific and severable (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1262)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1262 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB561ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (92-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (92-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22SenateAmendments specific and severable (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-12SenateGovernor's substitute printed 20110012D-S3
2020-03-12SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 11, 2020
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-26SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB561ER)
2020-02-26SenateEnrolled
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2020-02-07SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB561S2
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106824D-S2
2020-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20105715D-S1
2020-02-06SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106824D-S2
2020-02-04SenateIncorporates SB741 (McPike)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2020-01-13SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105715D-S1
2020-01-13SenateIncorporates SB924 (Cosgrove)
2020-01-13SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104533D

Same As/Similar To

SB741 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB924 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
HB438 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1206)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652107(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB561&201+sum+SB561
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB561+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB561S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB561S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB561ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB561S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB561ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1262+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0008+SB0561
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0148+SB0561
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0357SB0561+SB0561
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0424SB0561+SB0561
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0277+SB0561
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1199+SB0561
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1979SB0561+SB0561
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1980SB0561+SB0561
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2255+SB0561

Bill Comments

feedback