VA SB544 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permit; judges exempt. Provides that a judge or justice of the Commonwealth may carry a concealed handgun throughout the Commonwealth without a permit.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; exemption includes any judge or justice of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/28/16 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB544ER) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 26-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (70-Y 26-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 16106312D-S1 |
2016-03-09 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2016-03-02 | House | Delegates: Miller, Cline, Tyler |
2016-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senators: Newman, Deeds, Carrico |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | House requested conference committee |
2016-02-26 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2016-02-25 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute (94-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB544H1 |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105641D-H1 |
2016-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105641D-H1 |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102950D |
Same As/Similar To
HB332 (Same As) 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)