VA SB530 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession and administration of epinephrine; restaurant employee. Authorizes any employee of a licensed restaurant to possess and administer epinephrine on the premises of the restaurant at which the employee is employed, provided that such employee is authorized by a prescriber and trained in the administration of epinephrine. The bill also requires the Department of Health, in conjunction with the Department of Health Professions, to develop policies and guidelines for the recognition and treatment of anaphylaxis in restaurants.
Title
Epinephrine; possession and administration by a restaurant employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 853 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB530ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104203D |