VA SB522 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-09 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-09 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Balance billing; emergency and elective services. Requires health care facilities and health care providers to determine if providers scheduled to deliver elective services to a covered person are in the network of the covered person's managed care plan. The measure requires that when an elective service provider is determined to be out-of-network, in order for the covered person to assume financial responsibility for the out-of-network provider's charges, the health care facility or provider shall (i) inform the covered person of the out-of-network status of the provider, (ii) provide the covered person with the opportunity to be referred to an in-network provider, and (iii) prepare a document for signature by the covered person in which the covered person or his legal representative assumes financial responsibility for services performed by the out-of-network provider, and the covered person must sign the document described in clause (iii). The bill provides that such requirements will also apply to a health care provider in an office-based setting making a referral for elective radiology or pathology services.
Title
Balance billing; emergency and elective services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Commerce and Labor (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-09 | Senate | Incorporated by Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Health Insurance |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102243D |
Same As/Similar To
SB172 (Similar To) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1081)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3438 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3445 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3445.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |