VA SB517 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing education programs; due process. Requires the Board of Nursing to comply with certain due process procedures in cases in which the Board places a nursing education program on conditional approval with terms and conditions that include a restriction on enrollment in the program following an informal fact-finding proceeding.
Title
Nursing education programs; requires Board of Nursing to implement certain due process requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644) | |
2012-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 644 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB517ER) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Title replaced 12105536D-H1 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB517H1 | |
2012-02-23 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105536D-H1 | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105536D-H1 | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB517S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105291D-S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105291D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103801D |