VA SB512 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); scholastic records; student addresses, phone numbers, and email addresses. Prohibits the custodian of a scholastic record from releasing the address, phone number, or email address of a student in response to a FOIA request without first obtaining the written consent of either the student or the student's parent or legal guardian.
Title
FOIA; student addresses, telephone numbers, and email addresses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 756 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB512ER) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 18108257D-S1 |
2018-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Wilt, Peace, Bulova |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Suetterlein, Newman, Lucas |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | House requested conference committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 42-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House with substitute (55-Y 42-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB512H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107514D-H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107514D-H1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104415D |