VA SB5116 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

In-home consumer-directed services; electronic visit verification; exception. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to implement an electronic visit verification system to confirm delivery of in-home services by providers of consumer-directed personal care, respite care, or companion services through the Commonwealth Coordinated Care Plus waiver program, Developmental Disability waiver program, or the Early and Periodic Screening Diagnosis and Treatment program and creates an exception to the requirement that providers of such services use the electronic visit verification system for providers who reside in the home of the person receiving services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-home consumer-directed services; electronic visit verification, exception.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-17HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-09SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-09-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-09-03SenateRead first time
2020-09-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-08-26SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-26SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-18SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-08-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 20200547D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321331.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback