VA SB508 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; members of the Virginia National Guard. Provides that any member of the Virginia National Guard residing in Virginia who is not eligible for in-state tuition shall be eligible for a grant for an amount up to the difference between in-state and out-of-state tuition, to the extent funds are available for such purpose.
Title
Tuition, in-state; members of Virginia National Guard.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Black [R] | Del. Thomas Garrett [R] | Sen. Mark Herring [D] | Sen. Jeffrey McWaters [R] |
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB508S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105196D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105196D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102359D |