VA SB507 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real Estate Appraiser Board; continuing education. Requires the Real Estate Appraiser Board to evaluate the development of a continuing education curriculum for licensees that includes the effects of the use of energy efficiency and renewable energy equipment on the determination of the fair market value in the appraisal of non-income-producing residential real estate. Under the bill, the Board is required to report its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology and the Housing Commission by November 1, 2012.
Title
Real Estate Appraiser Board; shall develop continuing education curriculum for licensees, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388) | |
2012-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB507ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB507S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104859D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104859D-S1 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101463D |
Same As/Similar To
HB433 (Same As) 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Educational Institutions
Professions and Occupations
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Educational Institutions
Professions and Occupations
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports