VA SB505 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Political parties to determine method of nominating candidates. Provides that only political parties may determine the method by which it nominates candidates for office and eliminates exceptions that allowed incumbents in certain cases to determine the method of nomination.
Title
Political parties; to determine method of nominating candidates.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101345D |