VA SB502 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local taxation for solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less. Provides that generating equipment of solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less shall be taxable by a locality, at a rate determined by such locality, but shall not exceed the real estate rate applicable in that locality, and that the exemption shall be as follows: 80 percent of the assessed value in the first five years in service after commencement of commercial operation, 70 percent of the assessed value in the second five years in service, and 60 percent of the assessed value for all remaining years in service. The bill also provides that (i) solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less shall not be exempt from the assessment of a revenue share by ordinance of that locality and (ii) nothing in the bill shall be construed to authorize local taxation of generating or storage equipment of solar photovoltaic projects that serve the electricity needs of that property upon which such solar facilities are located. If a locality assesses a revenue share on such projects, the amount of the exemption shall be 100 percent of the assessed value. The bill does not apply to projects five megawatts or less that were approved by a locality prior to July 1, 2022. Local taxation for solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less. Provides that generating equipment of solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less shall be taxable by a locality, at a rate determined by such locality, but shall not exceed the real estate rate applicable in that locality, and that the exemption shall be as follows: 80 percent of the assessed value in the first five years in service after commencement of commercial operation, 70 percent of the assessed value in the second five years in service, and 60 percent of the assessed value for all remaining years in service. The bill also provides that (i) solar photovoltaic projects five megawatts or less shall not be exempt from the assessment of a revenue share by ordinance of that locality and (ii) nothing in the bill shall be construed to authorize local taxation of generating or storage equipment of solar photovoltaic projects that serve the electricity needs of that property upon which such solar facilities are located. If a locality assesses a revenue share on such projects, the amount of the exemption shall be 100 percent of the assessed value. The bill does not apply to projects five megawatts or less that were approved by a locality prior to July 1, 2022.
Title
Solar photovoltaic projects; local taxation for projects less than five megawatts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 30-N) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 30-N) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB502ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 22106928D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 30-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute (68-Y 30-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB502H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106928D-H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106928D-H1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB502S1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105586D-S1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105586D-S1 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104123D |