VA SB496 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; culinary lodging resorts. Allows culinary lodging resorts, as defined in the bill, to obtain a mixed beverage restaurant license, which authorizes such resorts to (i) sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption, without regard to the amount of gross receipts from the sale of food prepared and consumed on the premises, in areas upon the licensed premises approved by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority and other designated areas of the resort, including outdoor areas under the control of the licensee; and (ii) permit the possession and consumption of lawfully acquired alcoholic beverages by persons to whom overnight lodging is being provided in bedrooms and private guest rooms. The bill also allows culinary lodging resorts to obtain a combined mixed beverage restaurant and caterer's license, which authorizes the licensee to operate as both a mixed beverage restaurant and mixed beverage caterer at the same business premises designated in the license, with a common alcoholic beverage inventory for purposes of the restaurant and catering operations.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; culinary lodging resort.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 15-N) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1009) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1009 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB496ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (84-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (84-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB496S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106245D-S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106245D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105126D |