VA SB494 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Criminal Justice Services; crisis intervention team training. Adds the Department for Aging and Rehabilitation Services and brain injury stakeholders to the list of entities with whom the Department of Criminal Justice Services is required to consult in developing a training program for all persons involved in the crisis intervention team programs and requires the curriculum for such training program to be part of the module on brain injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crisis intervention team training; defines and adds to stakeholders, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-19HouseReferred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20104692D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB494E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104692D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91188(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback